HI SB120 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-23 - Act 037, 4/22/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1137).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-23 - Act 037, 4/22/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1137).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the public utilities commission to establish a policy to implement economic incentives and cost recovery regulatory mechanisms to induce and accelerate electric utilities' cost reduction efforts, encourage greater utilization of renewable energy, accelerate the retirement of utility fossil generation, and increase investments to modernize the State's electrical grids. (SD1)
Title
Public Utilities Commission; Electric Utilities; Economic Incentives; Cost Recovery
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-23 | Senate | Act 037, 4/22/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1137). |
2013-04-23 | House | Act 037, on 4/22/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1137). |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 474). |
2013-04-09 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-04-05 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1548), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-04-01 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Kawakami, Belatti, Brower, Cachola, Evans, C. Lee, Tsuji, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey, Cabanilla, Carroll, Har, Ito, McDermott. |
2013-03-27 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 04-01-13 2:25PM in conference room 325. |
2013-03-27 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-01-13. |
2013-03-25 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-27-13 3:58PM in conference room 325. |
2013-03-25 | House | The committee(s) on recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03/27/13. |
2013-03-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-25-13 at 3:00 pm in House conference room 325. |
2013-03-20 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cabanilla, Choy, Hashem, Oshiro, Say, Tokioka excused (6). |
2013-03-20 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1041), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2013-03-19 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Thielen, Coffman, Cullen, Evans, Hanohano, Kawakami, Lowen, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-19-13 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to EEP, CPC, referral sheet 30 |
2013-03-01 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-02-28 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 35) in amended form (SD 1). |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) English, Kahele). Transmitted to House. |
2013-02-20 | Senate | One Day Notice 02-28-13. |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 459) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2013-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPN were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria, Nishihara, Solomon, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi. |
2013-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-13 8:30AM in conference room 229. |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and recommitted to CPN. |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 117) as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of recommittal to CPN. |
2013-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS and be recommitted. The votes in CPN were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria, Nishihara, Solomon, Taniguchi, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 02-06-13 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to CPN. |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |