HI SB1193 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1193
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-09 - The committee on HRE deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-09 - The committee on HRE deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism to establish a grant program to assist persons who use albizia trees to create usable commercial products or are developing ways to use albizia trees to create usable products. Requires the Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism, in consultation with certain academic units of the University of Hawaii, to study economically feasible ways in which businesses may use albizia trees to produce usable commercial products, including housing, throughout the State. Appropriates moneys.
Title
Relating To Albizia.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-09 | Senate | The committee on HRE deferred the measure. |
2023-02-09 | Senate | The committee on AEN deferred the measure. |
2023-02-09 | Senate | The committee on EET deferred the measure. |
2023-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET/HRE/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-23 1:04PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Referred to EET/HRE/AEN, WAM. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1193 (Carry Over) 2023-02-09 - The committee on HRE deferred the measure.
HB466 (Same As) 2023-01-30 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Wednesday 02-01-23 10:00AM in conference room 423 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
HB466 (Same As) 2023-01-30 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Wednesday 02-01-23 10:00AM in conference room 423 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1193&year=2023 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2023/bills/SB1193_.HTM |