HI SB1189 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires recipients of general assistance, food stamps, and temporary assistance to submit to drug testing for reasonable cause.
Title
Drug Testing; Recipients of Government Assistance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-12 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be HELD. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Ihara, Green; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Hemmings. | |
2009-02-05 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-09 1:45 PM in conference room 016. | |
2009-01-30 | (S) Referred to HMS, JGO. | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1189&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/SB1189_.HTM |