HI SB1186 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-14 - (H) Act 103, on 6/9/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1206).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-14 - (H) Act 103, on 6/9/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1206).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Applies a daily transient accommodations tax to each transient accommodation furnished on a complimentary or gratuitous basis, or otherwise at no charge. Imposes a ceiling on the amount of transient accommodation tax funds transferred to the tourism special fund and to the counties from 7/1/2011 through 6/30/2015. (CD1)
Title
Transient Accommodations Tax; Minimum Daily Tax; Time Share Rate; County Distribution
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-14 | (H) Act 103, on 6/9/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1206). | |
2011-06-14 | (S) Act 103, 6/9/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1206). | |
2011-05-06 | (S) Enrolled to Governor. | |
2011-05-05 | (S) Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 702). | |
2011-05-04 | (H) Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 694). | |
2011-05-03 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) Brower voting no (1) and Representative(s) Carroll, Pine excused (2). | |
2011-05-03 | (S) Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ryan . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-04-29 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-11. | |
2011-04-29 | (S) Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 139). | |
2011-04-29 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-03-11. | |
2011-04-29 | (H) Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 139) as amended in (CD 1). | |
2011-04-29 | (H) The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, Chong, Choy, M. Lee, Riviere; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-04-29 | (S) The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Ige, Kouchi, English, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-04-28 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-29-11 3:15PM in conference room 309. | |
2011-04-27 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-11 3:15PM in conference room 309. | |
2011-04-26 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-11 2:30PM in conference room 309. | |
2011-04-25 | (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-26-11 2:35PM in conference room 309. | |
2011-04-25 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 672). | |
2011-04-21 | (H) House conferees appointed: M. Oshiro Chair; Chong, Choy, M. Lee, Riviere. | |
2011-04-19 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 649). | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Kim, Chair; Ige, Kouchi, Co-Chair(s); English, Tokuda. | |
2011-04-14 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 605). | |
2011-04-14 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2011-04-14 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 509). | |
2011-04-12 | (H) Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Ching, Fontaine, Hanohano, Johanson, Kawakami, McKelvey, Morikawa, Takai voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Awana, Belatti, Brower, Marumoto, Pine, Ward voting no (6) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-04-08 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Marumoto, Pine, Ward voting no (3) and Representative(s) Takumi excused (1). | |
2011-04-08 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1453) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2011-04-04 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Chong, Choy, Coffman, Cullen, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, C. Lee, Tokioka, Yamashita, Riviere; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Morikawa; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Marumoto; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. | |
2011-04-01 | (H) Proposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 04-04-11 3:30PM in House conference room 308. | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Referred to FIN, referral sheet 33 | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 268) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Green, Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 699) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2011-03-01 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kim, Kouchi, Tokuda, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ryan ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-02-25 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-01-11 9:20AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-02-17 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2011-02-17 | (S) Reported from TSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 307) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2011-02-15 | (S) The committee(s) on TSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Galuteria, Kahele; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi. | |
2011-02-10 | (S) The committee(s) on TSM deferred the measure until 02-15-11 1:15PM in conference room 224. | |
2011-02-02 | (S) The committee(s) on TSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-11 1:20PM in conference room 224. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Referred to TSM, WAM. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Introduced. |