HI SB1182 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB1182

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Repeals section 171-8.5, Hawaii Revised Statutes, establishing the Koke'e State Park Advisory Council.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Koke'e State Park Advisory Council.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-02-19SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
2021-02-19SenateReported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 487) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC.
2021-02-17SenateThe committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Keith-Agaran, Misalucha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Riviere.
2021-02-12SenateThe committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-17-21 1:00PM; CR 229 & Videoconference.
2021-01-29SenateReferred to WTL, JDC.
2021-01-27SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-27SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB1028 (Same As)
SB1182 (Carry Over) 2021-02-19 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback