HI SB1178 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-19 - (H) Act 033, on 4/19/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 245).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-19 - (H) Act 033, on 4/19/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 245).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates $40,000,000 in general funds and $80,000,000 in federal Medicaid funds to address a funding shortfall in the Medicaid program. (SB1178 HD2)
Title
Emergency Appropriation; Medicaid Payments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-19 | (H) Act 033, on 4/19/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 245). | |
2010-04-19 | (S) Act 033, 4/19/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 491). | |
2010-04-12 | (S) Enrolled to Governor. | |
2010-04-12 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 557). | |
2010-04-12 | (S) Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 560). | |
2010-04-12 | (H) House conferee(s) discharged: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, Yamane (Co-)Chairman; Finnegan. | |
2010-04-12 | (H) House conferees appointed: Yamane, M. Oshiro Co-Chairs; Finnegan. | |
2010-04-09 | (H) Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 538). | |
2010-04-09 | (H) Received notice of agreement (Sen. Com. No. 538). | |
2010-04-09 | (S) Passed Final Reading. 21 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom. 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Takamine, Tsutsui. | |
2010-04-08 | (S) One Day Notice 04-09-10. | |
2010-04-08 | (S) Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-09-10. | |
2010-04-07 | (S) Deferred until 04-08-10. | |
2010-04-07 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 419). | |
2010-04-06 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Bertram, Hanohano excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2010-04-05 | (H) Received from Governor re: emergency appropriation (Gov. Msg. No. 221). | |
2010-04-01 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-06-10. | |
2010-04-01 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1233-10) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-31 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Aquino, Awana, Brower, Choy, Coffman, Har, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Sagum, Tokioka, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Keith-Agaran, Wooley, Finnegan. | |
2010-03-31 | (H) Proposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-31-10 7:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-03-27 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Chang, Herkes, McKelvey, Pine, Takai, Tokioka excused (6). | |
2009-03-25 | (H) Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1256) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2009-03-24 | (H) The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Nishimoto, Bertram, Brower, Mizuno, Shimabukuro, Finnegan; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Carroll. | |
2009-03-20 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 03-24-09 10:00AM in House conference room 329. | |
2009-03-12 | (H) Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 27 | |
2009-03-12 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2009-03-10 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 327) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2009-03-10 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Galuteria). Transmitted to House. | |
2009-03-06 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-09. | |
2009-03-06 | (S) Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 737) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2009-03-03 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Ige, Espero, Ihara, Sakamoto, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Green. | |
2009-02-27 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 03-03-09 9:30am in conference room 229. | |
2009-02-20 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN. | |
2009-02-20 | (S) Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 289) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN. | |
2009-02-13 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Green, Baker, Nishihara, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Espero. | |
2009-02-11 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH deferred the measure until 02-13-09 2:40pm in conference room 016. | |
2009-02-06 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-09 3:00pm in conference room 016. | |
2009-01-30 | (S) Referred to HTH, CPN. | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Introduced. |