HI SB1177 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-01 - Act 066, 4/30/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1166).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-01 - Act 066, 4/30/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1166).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Replaces the Reentry Coordinator with the Director of Public Safety, of the Director's designee, as an ex officio nonvoting member of the Reentry Commission. (SB1177 HD1)
Title
Reentry Commission
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-01 | Senate | Act 066, 4/30/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1166). |
2013-05-01 | House | Act 066, on 4/30/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1166). |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2013-04-16 | House | Received notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 696). |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Passed Final Reading. 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 699). |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: Aquino, Rhoads Co-Chairs; Ing, McDermott. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-16-13. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-16-13. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-11-13 in disagreeing to the House amendments. |
2013-04-11 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 607). |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 611). |
2013-04-09 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-04-05 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice, Tuesday 04-09-13. |
2013-04-05 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1491) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-04-02 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Har, Belatti, Brower, Kawakami, C. Lee, Tsuji, Wooley, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, Ito. |
2013-03-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 04-02-13 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-03-21 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Belatti, Say excused (2). |
2013-03-21 | House | Reported from PBS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1109), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2013-03-14 | House | The committees on PBS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Ing, Hashem, Nakashima, Yamane, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Takumi. |
2013-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by PBS on Thursday, 03-14-13 9:30AM in House conference room 309. |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to PBS, JUD, referral sheet 30 |
2013-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 333). |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Deferred until 03-05-13. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-01-13. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 479) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2013-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Green; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Slom. |
2013-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-13 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Referred to PSM. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB946 (Same As) 2013-02-15 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Coffman, Hanohano, Har, Kawakami, Ward excused (6).