HI SB1176 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the owner of a dangerous dog from allowing the dog to roam freely without supervision. Authorizes an animal control officer to investigate complaints regarding dangerous dogs, to pick up freely roaming dangerous dogs, and to issue citations. Establishes penalties for owners who fail to adequately supervise dangerous dogs. Requires owners of dangerous dogs to obtain liability insurance if the dog is found to be inadequately supervised.
Title
Dangerous Dogs; Owner Responsibility; Penalties
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-13 | (S) The committee on JGO deferred the measure. | |
2009-02-09 | (S) The committee(s) on JGO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-09 9:30am in conference room 016. | |
2009-01-30 | (S) Referred to JGO. | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1176&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/SB1176_.HTM |