HI SB1175 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of health and Hawaii state hospital to consider certain recommendations made by the senate special investigative committee on the Hawaii state hospital and submit a written report to the legislature of its status of implementing certain recommendations prior to the regular sessions of 2016 and 2017. (SD2)
Title
Hawaii State Hospital; Department of Health
Sponsors
Sen. Josh Green [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] |
Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Gil Riviere [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] |
Sen. Sam Slom [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-03-27 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Choy, Ing, Lowen, Luke, McKelvey, Pouha excused (6). |
2015-03-27 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1154), recommending referral to FIN. |
2015-03-24 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Keohokalole, Aquino, Ichiyama, Johanson, LoPresti, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Takumi, Tupola. |
2015-03-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 03-24-15 9:45AM in House conference room 309. |
2015-03-20 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on LAB with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Kawakami, LoPresti, Luke, Saiki excused (4). |
2015-03-20 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 989), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to LAB. |
2015-03-18 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Creagan, Hashem, Jordan, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Oshiro, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola. |
2015-03-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 03-18-15 8:45AM in House conference room 329. |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to HLT, LAB, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2015-03-12 | House | Pass First Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 327) in amended form (SD 2). |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-15. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 848) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2015-03-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-02-15 1:00PM in conference room 211. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Reported from HTH/JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 383) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2015-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Espero, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, L. Thielen, Slom. |
2015-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Gabbard, Riviere, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Slom. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH/JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-15 9:20AM in conference room 016. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to HTH/JDL, WAM. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Introduced. |