HI SB1174 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the director of health to establish, by rule, motor vehicle emission standards by adopting the motor vehicle emission standards established by the State of California.
Title
Motor Vehicle Emissions; California Code; Rules
Sponsors
Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Carol Fukunaga [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] |
Sen. Josh Green [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-20 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to TIA. | |
2009-02-20 | (S) Reported from ENE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 370) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to TIA. | |
2009-02-17 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in ENE were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, English, Green, Hooser, Ihara, Kokubun; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Hemmings; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2009-02-12 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE deferred the measure until 02-17-09 2:45 PM in conference room 225. | |
2009-02-09 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-09 4:00pm in conference room 225. | |
2009-01-30 | (S) Referred to ENE, TIA. | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Introduced. |