HI SB1169 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1169
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies that certain provisions of the Internal Revenue Code related to at-risk rules and deductions and to passive activity loss do not apply with respect to claims for the state low-income housing tax credit. Appropriates funds to establish one position in the Hawaii Housing Finance and Development Corporation to oversee the Low-Income Housing Tax Credit Program.
Title
Relating To The Low-income Housing Tax Credit.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Reported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 499) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HOU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Harimoto, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Nishihara. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU deferred the measure until 02-14-17 2:45PM in conference room 225. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-17 3:00PM in conference room 225. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Referred to HOU,WAM. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1169 (Carry Over) 2017-02-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
HB1335 (Same As) 2017-02-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).
HB1335 (Same As) 2017-02-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1169&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/SB1169_.HTM |