HI SB1168 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-26 - (S) The conference committee deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-26 - (S) The conference committee deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits use of tobacco products by minors. Authorizes law enforcement officer to confiscate tobacco products used by minors. Effective January 1, 2050. (SB1168 HD1)
Title
Tobacco Products; Minors; Use; Prohibition; Confiscation
Sponsors
Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Gilbert Kahele [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-26 | (S) The conference committee deferred the measure. | |
2012-04-24 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-12 2:00PM in conference room 229. | |
2012-04-20 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-12 2:00PM in conference room 229. | |
2012-04-18 | (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-20-12 2:00PM in conference room 229. | |
2012-04-17 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611). | |
2012-04-16 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 752). | |
2012-04-16 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Chun Oakland, Chair; Hee, Co-Chair(s); Green, Wakai, Slom. | |
2012-04-16 | (H) House conferees appointed: Yamane, Keith-Agaran Co-Chairs; Brower, Morikawa, Ching. | |
2012-04-12 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 679). | |
2012-04-12 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2012-04-10 | (S) Deferred until 04-12-12. | |
2012-04-10 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 374). | |
2012-04-05 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Thielen excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-04-03 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Thursday, 04-05-12. | |
2012-04-03 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1504-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2012-03-29 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Keith-Agaran, Rhoads, Brower, Herkes, Ito, Souki, Tsuji, Fontaine, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Cabanilla, Carroll, Coffman, Luke, McKelvey, Marumoto. | |
2012-03-27 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 03-29-12 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2012-03-20 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Chang, Herkes, Nakashima, Pine, Tokioka excused (5). | |
2012-03-20 | (H) Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1130-12), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. | |
2012-03-16 | (H) The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Yamane, Morikawa, Belatti, Hanohano, C. Lee, Mizuno, Wooley; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Jordan, Ching, Pine. | |
2012-03-13 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 03-16-12 9:30AM in House conference room 329. | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Referred to HLT, JUD, referral sheet 41 | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 46) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2012-03-06 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-03-02 | (S) Deferred until 03-06-12. | |
2012-03-01 | (S) One Day Notice 03-02-12. | |
2012-03-01 | (S) Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2509) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. | |
2012-02-24 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. | |
2012-02-22 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-24-12 11:30AM in conference room 016. | |
2012-02-17 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. | |
2012-02-17 | (S) Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2352) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. | |
2012-02-14 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Green; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. | |
2012-02-10 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-12 1:25PM in conference room 016. | |
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-02-08 | (S) The committee on HMS deferred the measure. | |
2011-02-02 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-11 2:00PM in conference room 016. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Referred to HMS, JDL. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Introduced. |