HI SB1162 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Act 221, on 07/06/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1349).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Act 221, on 07/06/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1349).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies conditions that must be met by applicants to receive funds under the forest stewardship program administered by the board of land and natural resources. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Forest Stewardship.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-21 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 2 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, Unamended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 2 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, Unamended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-07 | House | Act 221, on 07/06/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1349). |
2021-07-07 | Senate | Act 221, 07/06/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1349). |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 634). |
2021-04-28 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 858). |
2021-04-27 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) LoPresti excused (1). |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2021-04-23 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-27-21. |
2021-04-23 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 99) as amended in (CD 1). |
2021-04-23 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-27-21. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 99). |
2021-04-21 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Lowen, Branco, Kong; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, English; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-21-21 2:45PM; CR 016. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-20-21 2:00PM; CR 016. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 559). |
2021-04-19 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 810). |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Inouye Chair; English Co-Chair; Keith-Agaran. |
2021-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Tarnas, Lowen, Branco Co-Chairs; Kong, McDermott. |
2021-04-15 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 790). |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 546). |
2021-04-13 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, LoPresti, Ohno excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-04-09 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-13-21. |
2021-04-09 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1832) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2021-03-31 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2021-03-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-31-21 1:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-24 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan excused (1). |
2021-03-24 | House | Reported from WAL/EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1364), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2021-03-18 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Marten, Hashem, Perruso, Todd, Tokioka, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Matayoshi. |
2021-03-18 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, Ganaden, B. Kobayashi, Kong, Morikawa, Ohno, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2021-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL/EEP on Thursday, 03-18-21 10:30AM in House conference room 430 & 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to WAL/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 22 |
2021-03-11 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-03-09 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 375) in amended form (SD 2). |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 886) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2021-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Moriwaki, Shimabukuro. |
2021-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-26-21 9:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 535) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Keith-Agaran, Misalucha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Riviere. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-17-21 1:00PM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1008 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Referred to WTL, WAM.