HI SB1161 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1161
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Referred to TRN, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Referred to TRN, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes rules, regulations, and permitting procedures for transportation network companies operating in the State. Makes permanent insurance requirements for transportation network companies and transportation network company drivers. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Transportation Network Companies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to TRN, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 380) in amended form (SD 2). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 989) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2019-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Nishihara, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | The committee on CPH has rescheduled its decision making to 02-26-19 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH will hold a public decision making on 02-26-19 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Reported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 389) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPH. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Harimoto ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-19 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Re-Referred to TRS, CPH. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to CPH/TRS. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1161 (Carry Over) 2019-03-07 - Referred to TRN, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 27
HB1093 (Same As) 2019-04-24 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-19 10:35AM in conference room 225.
HB1093 (Same As) 2019-04-24 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-19 10:35AM in conference room 225.