HI SB1159 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1159
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Labor & Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Labor & Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates unspecified sums of general fund revenues for fiscal years 2021-2022 and 2022-2023 for the purpose of reimbursing the federal government for moneys lent to the State for the payment of unemployment benefit claims. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Employment Security.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to LAT/PDP, FIN , referral sheet 22 |
2021-03-11 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-03-09 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 374) in amended form (SD 2). |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 966) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2021-03-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-04-21 10:00AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | The committee on WAM deferred the measure. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-08-21 10:50AM in conference room 211. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Reported from LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Chang, Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-21 3:00PM in conference room 225. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to LCA, WAM. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1005 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB1159 (Carry Over) 2021-03-11 - Referred to LAT/PDP, FIN , referral sheet 22
SB1159 (Carry Over) 2021-03-11 - Referred to LAT/PDP, FIN , referral sheet 22