HI SB1153 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1153
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-Referred to JDC, WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-Referred to JDC, WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits a person from posting, maintaining, displaying, or erecting any sign on public property that urges voters to vote for an election candidate. Designates the candidate that the sign urges voters to vote for as the party responsible for removing the sign. Allows the Campaign Spending Commission to impose fines for violations and place a lien against the campaign account of the candidate if the sign is not removed within 2 weeks of receipt of written notice. Allows the candidate to object to written notice of removal. Requires the Campaign Spending Commission to adopt rules.
Title
Relating To Campaign Signs.
Sponsors
Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-17 | Senate | Re-Referred to JDC, WAM. |
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-02-03 | Senate | The committee on JDL deferred the measure. |
2017-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-17 8:45AM in conference room 016. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Referred to JDL, WAM. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1153 (Carry Over) 2017-02-03 - The committee on JDL deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1153&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SB1153_.HTM |