HI SB1141 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-30 - Act 146, 06/29/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1249).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-30 - Act 146, 06/29/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1249).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Transfers the rights, powers, functions, duties, resources, and individual budget of the Hawaii State Public Library System relating to workers' compensation for its employees from the Department of Education to the Department of Human Resources Development. Transfers one full-time equivalent permanent position from the Hawaii State Public Library System to the Department of Human Resources Development. Appropriates funds for the salary and benefits of a human resources specialist position to the Department of Human Resources Development. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Workers' Compensation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-28 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-28 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Senate Labor and Technology: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-28 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Senate Labor and Technology: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-30 | Senate | Act 146, 06/29/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1249). |
2023-06-30 | House | Act 146, on 06/29/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1249). |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 901). |
2023-05-04 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 996). |
2023-05-04 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Lowen, Martinez excused (2). |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1) Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). |
2023-05-02 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Thursday, 05-04-23. |
2023-05-02 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 184) as amended in (CD 1). |
2023-05-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-04-23. |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 184). |
2023-04-28 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Woodson, Garrett, Marten, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-04-28 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Kidani, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-23 4:30PM; Conference Room 309 |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-23 1:30PM; Conference Room 016. |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-23 10:30AM; Conference Room 016. |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-23 10:30AM; Conference Room 016. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-26-23 10:30AM; Conference Room 016. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 840). |
2023-04-21 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Matayoshi, Woodson, Garrett Co-Chairs; Marten, Alcos. |
2023-04-21 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 944). |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Moriwaki Chair; Kidani Co-Chair; Fevella. |
2023-04-13 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 888). |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 772). |
2023-04-11 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Martinez, Todd excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2023-04-06 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-11-23. |
2023-04-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2114) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2023-03-31 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Takenouchi, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Poepoe, Alcos. |
2023-03-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 03-31-23 3:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-03-24 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ilagan excused (1). |
2023-03-24 | House | Reported from LGO/EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1559) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2023-03-23 | House | The committee on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Marten, Evslin, Kapela, La Chica, Matayoshi, Perruso, Todd; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Martinez, Quinlan, Garcia. |
2023-03-23 | House | The committee on LGO recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Garrett, Kapela, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Martinez, Sayama, Tam. |
2023-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LGO/EDN on Thursday, 03-23-23 11:00AM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to LGO/EDN, FIN, referral sheet 17 |
2023-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2023-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 368) in amended form (SD 2). |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-23. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 993) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2023-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-23 10:00AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Reported from LBT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 337) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2023-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBT were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Lee, Ihara, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2023-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBT has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Referred to LBT, WAM. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Appropriation
DHRD
DOE
Expenditure Ceiling ($)
Hawaii State Public Library System
Position
Workers' Compensation
DHRD
DOE
Expenditure Ceiling ($)
Hawaii State Public Library System
Position
Workers' Compensation