HI SB1141 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1141
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to the department of land and natural resources for the purpose of refurbishing and retrofitting the Kulani water tanks to serve as water reservoirs for firefighting. Takes effect 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Making An Appropriation To The Department Of Land And Natural Resources.
Sponsors
Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] |
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Gil Riviere [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 227) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Nishihara, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-19 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1141 (Carry Over) 2019-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.