HI SB1137 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1137
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the 2050 grid resiliency and view planes initiative to mandate that all utility lines be installed underground by December 31, 2050, under certain conditions. Requires a public utility to establish a plan for reaching certain target dates for completion of the initiative. Provides exemptions.
Title
Relating To Utility Lines.
Sponsors
Sen. Gil Riviere [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to CPH/EET, WAM. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1069 (Same As) 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
SB1137 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to CPH/EET, WAM.
SB1137 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to CPH/EET, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1137&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB1137_.HTM |