HI SB1130 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1130
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-24 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-24 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires an investigator to issue a citation to any person acting in the capacity of or engaging in the business of a contractor within the State without having a required license.
Title
Relating To Licensing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-24 | Senate | The committee on CPH deferred the measure. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-24-17 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Referred to CPH. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1130 (Carry Over) 2017-02-24 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
HB378 (Same As) 2017-02-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).
HB378 (Same As) 2017-02-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1130&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/SB1130_.HTM |