HI SB1124 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-10 - Act 090, 06/05/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1190).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-10 - Act 090, 06/05/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1190).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies the requirements for obtaining a small boat harbor use permit to specify the documentary requirements to obtain a permit or to be placed on the permit waitlist. Authorizes vessel inspections by the DLNR to satisfy permit requirements. (CD1)
Title
Small Boat Harbors; Permit; Waitlist
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-10 | Senate | Act 090, 06/05/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1190). |
2015-06-10 | House | Act 090, on 06/05/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1190). |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 680). |
2015-05-05 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 699). |
2015-05-05 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2015-05-02 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-05-15. |
2015-05-01 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 121) as amended in (CD 1). |
2015-05-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-05-15. |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 121). |
2015-05-01 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Cullen, Evans; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Pouha. |
2015-05-01 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Galuteria, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-04-30 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 05-01-15 3:30PM in conference room 224. |
2015-04-28 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-30-15 1:30PM in conference room 224. |
2015-04-27 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-28-15 1:10PM in conference room 224. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 624). |
2015-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 642). |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Yamane, Cullen Co-Chairs; Evans, Pouha. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: L. Thielen Chair; Galuteria, Slom. |
2015-04-16 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 638). |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 584). |
2015-04-14 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-04-10 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1548), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-04-07 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. |
2015-04-02 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-07-15 2:45PM in conference room 308. |
2015-04-02 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be deferred until 04-07-15. |
2015-04-01 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2015-03-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 04-02-15 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2015-03-25 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Ing, Luke excused (2). |
2015-03-25 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1068) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2015-03-20 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Cullen, Evans, Ing, C. Lee, Lowen, Nishimoto, Say, Pouha, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2015-03-17 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Friday, 03-20-15 11:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2015-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2015-03-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 38). |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Kouchi). Transmitted to House. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-06-15. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 613) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Galuteria, Ihara, Riviere, Ruderman, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2015-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-15 3:00PM in conference room 224. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to WTL. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB955 (Same As) 2015-02-12 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and C. Lee excused (1).