HI SB1123 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the office of sports development within DBEDT.
Title
Sports; Office of Sports Development
Sponsors
Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Sen. Pohai Ryan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-02-02 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT recommend(s) that the measure be HELD. The votes in EDT were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Fukunaga, Wakai, Baker, Solomon, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-01-27 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-11 1:45PM in conference room 016. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Referred to EDT, WAM. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1123 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/SB1123_.HTM |