HI SB112 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB112
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-20 - Referred to EET, WAM.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-20 - Referred to EET, WAM.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the position of the Tourism Liaison Officer within the Office of the Governor. Makes an appropriation.
Title
Relating To Tourism.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-20 | Senate | Referred to EET, WAM. |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Introduced and passed First Reading. |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB112 (Carry Over) 2023-01-20 - Referred to EET, WAM.
HB1239 (Same As) 2023-02-10 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and none excused (0).
HB1239 (Same As) 2023-02-10 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and none excused (0).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=112&year=2023 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2023/bills/SB112_.HTM |