HI SB112 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB112
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires, between fiscal year 2020-2021 and fiscal year 2030-2031, each county to authorize construction for a specified number of new housing units. Reduces the amount of transient accommodations tax revenue the counties receive for failure to meet the requirements. Allows for recoupment of reduction under certain circumstances. Repeals June 30, 2031.
Title
Relating To Housing Production.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to PSM/HOU/EET, WAM. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB112 (Carry Over) 2019-01-22 - Referred to PSM/HOU/EET, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=112&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB112_.HTM |