HI SB1118 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1118
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-03 - The committee on HHS deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-03 - The committee on HHS deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Reduces and eliminates the general excise tax for the sale of groceries that are eligible under the Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program or Special Supplemental Nutrition Program for Women, Infants, and Children over a four-year period. Reduces and eliminates the general excise tax for the sale of nonprescription drugs, medical supplies, and durable medical equipment over a four-year period.
Title
Relating To General Excise Tax.
Sponsors
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] |
Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] | Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-03 | Senate | The committee on HHS deferred the measure. |
2023-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-23 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Referred to HHS, WAM. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1118 (Carry Over) 2023-02-03 - The committee on HHS deferred the measure.
HB1483 (Same As) 2023-02-03 - The committee(s) on ECD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HB1483 (Same As) 2023-02-03 - The committee(s) on ECD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1118&year=2023 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2023/bills/SB1118_.HTM |