HI SB1110 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1110
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-04 - Re-Referred to PSM/GVO, WAM.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-04 - Re-Referred to PSM/GVO, WAM.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a Statewide Interoperable Communications Executive Committee for public safety communications and the position of the Statewide Interoperable Communications Coordinator.
Title
Relating To Statewide Interoperable Public Safety Communications.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-04 | Senate | Re-Referred to PSM/GVO, WAM. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to PSM/GVO/LCA, WAM. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1110 (Carry Over) 2021-02-04 - Re-Referred to PSM/GVO, WAM.
HB956 (Same As) 2021-02-18 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1).
HB956 (Same As) 2021-02-18 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1110&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/SB1110_.HTM |