HI SB1097 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1097
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies that a government agency does not assume ownership or jurisdiction over a disputed road solely through maintenance or repair activities. Authorizes the State to transfer ownership of roads in favor of counties by quitclaim if requested by the county.
Title
Relating To Transportation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Re-Referred to PSM/TCA, JDC/WAM. |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Referred to PSM/TCA, JDC. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1097 (Carry Over) 2023-02-01 - Re-Referred to PSM/TCA, JDC/WAM.
HB1187 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
HB1187 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1097&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB1097_.HTM |