HI SB1095 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-26 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-13 4:00PM in conference room 329.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-26 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-13 4:00PM in conference room 329.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Early Childhood Education Program within the Early Learning System. Effective July 1, 2030. (SB1095 HD2)
Title
Early Childhood Education Program
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-13 4:00PM in conference room 329. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-13 9:30AM in conference room 329. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-13 3:00PM in conference room 329. |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-13 3:00PM in conference room 329. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 703). |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-19-13 3:00PM in conference room 329. |
2013-04-17 | House | House conferee(s) added: Representative(s) Rhoads as Co-Chairs. |
2013-04-17 | House | Re-referred to EDN, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 57 |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-17-13 3:00PM in conference room 329. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 699). |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: Takumi, Luke Co-Chairs; Ohno, Fale. |
2013-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 692). |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Tokuda, Chair; Ige, Co-Chair(s); Keith-Agaran, Kidani, L. Thielen. |
2013-04-11 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 607). |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 603). |
2013-04-09 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Cheape, Fale, Fukumoto, Johanson, Jordan, Lowen, McKelvey, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Cabanilla, Hanohano voting no (2) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-04-05 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-09-13. |
2013-04-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1585) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-04-02 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Takayama, Tokioka, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Johanson, Jordan, Lowen, Onishi, Fukumoto; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson, Ward. |
2013-03-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-02-13 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2013-03-18 | House | Re-referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 39 |
2013-03-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Coffman, Fale, Hanohano, Jordan, Lowen voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Mizuno, Oshiro, Takai excused (3). |
2013-03-15 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 980) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2013-03-13 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ohno, Choy, Hanohano, Ichiyama, Nakashima, Takai, Cheape, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino. |
2013-03-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Wednesday, 03-13-13 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to EDN, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2013-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 302) in amended form (SD 2). |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Nishihara, Taniguchi, L. Thielen . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Kim, Ruderman). Transmitted to House. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 727) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2013-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Kouchi, Ruderman, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) L. Thielen ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-27-13 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-21-13 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) L. Thielen. |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 133) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2013-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kidani, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2013-01-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-13 1:20PM in conference room 414. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB864 (Same As) 2013-02-15 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Fale, McKelvey, Morikawa, Thielen voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll, Coffman, Hanohano, Har, Kawakami, Ward excused (6).