HI SB1082 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1082
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the definition of compensation for the purpose of calculating retirement benefits for public officers and employees. Applies to personnel and payroll reported after 12/31/2021. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Employees' Retirement System.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Reported from LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 478) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Re-Referred to LCA, JDC/WAM. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, Chang, Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-21 3:00PM in conference room 225. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to LCA, JDC. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB928 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB1082 (Carry Over) 2021-02-19 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
SB1082 (Carry Over) 2021-02-19 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.