HI SB1076 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-16 - (S) Act 118, 6/14/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1221).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-16 - (S) Act 118, 6/14/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1221).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes it unlawful for any employer or labor organization with more than one hundred employees and a collective bargaining agreement to bar or discharge from employment, withhold pay from, or demote an employee solely because the employee uses accrued and available sick leave. Effective July 1, 2011. (SB1076 HD3)
Title
Employee Benefits; Employment Practices; Sick Leave
Sponsors
Sen. Clayton Hee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-16 | (S) Act 118, 6/14/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1221). | |
2011-06-16 | (H) Act 118, on 6/14/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1221). | |
2011-04-20 | (S) Enrolled to Governor. | |
2011-04-20 | (H) Received notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 652). | |
2011-04-20 | (S) Passed Final Reading. 23 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom. 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ige. | |
2011-04-19 | (S) One Day Notice 04-20-11. | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-20-11. | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Reconsideration of action taken on 04-14-11 in disagreeing to the House amendments. | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 652). | |
2011-04-18 | (H) House conferees appointed: Rhoads, McKelvey, Keith-Agaran, Yamashita Co-Chairs; Ichiyama, M. Lee, Johanson. | |
2011-04-14 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 605). | |
2011-04-14 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2011-04-14 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 496). | |
2011-04-12 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 3 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Marumoto voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-04-08 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-12-11. | |
2011-04-08 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1551) as amended in HD 3, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2011-03-31 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Chong, Choy, Coffman, Cullen, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Marumoto; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2011-03-28 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-31-11 2:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2011-03-24 | (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting no and Har, Riviere, Wooley excused. | |
2011-03-24 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1200) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. | |
2011-03-22 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Keith-Agaran, Rhoads, Brower, Cabanilla, Herkes, Ito, Luke, McKelvey, B. Oshiro, Souki, Tsuji, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Fontaine; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Marumoto; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll. | |
2011-03-18 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 03-22-11 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-03-17 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting no (0) and Har, Pine, Saiki, Say excused (4). | |
2011-03-17 | (H) Reported from LAB/ERB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 966) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. | |
2011-03-15 | (H) The committees on ERB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Choy, Awana, Brower, Hashem, Tsuji, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Marumoto; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Evans, Nishimoto, Tokioka. | |
2011-03-15 | (H) The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Yamashita, Aquino, Cullen, Ichiyama, M. Lee, Luke, Saiki, Souki, Takumi; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Fontaine, Johanson; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2011-03-11 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB/ERB on Tuesday, 03-15-11 10:00AM in House conference room 309. | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Referred to LAB/ERB, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 33 | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 241) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2011-03-04 | (S) Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 563) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2011-02-08 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. | |
2011-02-04 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-11 10:00AM in conference room 016. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Referred to JDL. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |