HI SB1073 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1073
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that the disqualification requirements for judges also apply to justices. Establishes a process by which a party before an appellate court in the State, who believes that the judge or justice presiding over their case may have a disqualifying conflict of interest, may move for a hearing on possible conflict of interest. Prohibits the appellate court judge or justice who is subject to the motion to hear or rule on the motion but allows them to file a response or voluntarily recuse themselves from presiding over the pending action or proceeding.
Title
Relating To The Judiciary.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-02-16 | Senate | The committee on JDC deferred the measure. |
2023-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-16-23 9:30AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1073 (Carry Over) 2023-02-16 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1073&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB1073_.HTM |