HI SB1073 | 2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future SB1073

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-16 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Clarifies that the disqualification requirements for judges also apply to justices. Establishes a process by which a party before an appellate court in the State, who believes that the judge or justice presiding over their case may have a disqualifying conflict of interest, may move for a hearing on possible conflict of interest. Prohibits the appellate court judge or justice who is subject to the motion to hear or rule on the motion but allows them to file a response or voluntarily recuse themselves from presiding over the pending action or proceeding.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Judiciary.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-16SenateThe committee on JDC deferred the measure.
2023-02-13SenateThe committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-16-23 9:30AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
2023-01-27SenateReferred to JDC.
2023-01-23SenatePassed First Reading.
2023-01-20SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

SB1073 (Carry Over) 2023-02-16 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback