HI SB1071 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1071
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows cases within the jurisdiction of the Intermediate Court of Appeals that involve a family court judgment, order, or decree affecting the custody of a child or minor to be transferred to the Supreme Court.
Title
Relating To The Family Court.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Referred to HHS, JDC. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1461 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
SB1071 (Carry Over) 2023-01-27 - Referred to HHS, JDC.
SB1071 (Carry Over) 2023-01-27 - Referred to HHS, JDC.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1071&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB1071_.HTM |