HI SB1068 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires foreclosing lender to give notice to tenants of rental housing units facing foreclosure before tenant may be served with an eviction notice. Requires landlords to give notice of pending foreclosure to tenants of dwelling units. Provides remedies.
Title
Mortgage Foreclosure; Real Estate; Rental Housing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-17 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be HELD. The votes in HMS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Ihara, Green, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2009-02-17 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be HELD. The votes in CPN were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Ige, Green, Ihara, Sakamoto, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Espero. | |
2009-02-06 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS-CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-17-09 1:15 PM in conference room 016. | |
2009-01-30 | (S) Referred to CPN/HMS, JGO. | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-26 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1068&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/SB1068_.HTM |