HI SB1062 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1062
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that all state and county agency contractors that dispose of liquid or solid waste provide a receipt that the waste or inert fill was received and disposed of at a department of health permitted or approved facility before payment is rendered for those contractual services. Allows for partial payment to be made without a receipt and prior to any dumping of waste. Prohibits alteration or falsification of receipts. Effective 7/1/2020. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Waste Management.
Sponsors
Sen. Laura Thielen [D] | Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] |
Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported from GVO/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 589) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Inouye, Baker, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Baker, Harimoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Fevella. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-19 2:45PM in conference room 225. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to GVO/PSM, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1062 (Carry Over) 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.