HI SB1059 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits certain businesses in the State from distributing single-use plastic checkout bags as defined in this Act. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Environmental Protection; Plastic Bags Prohibited
Sponsors
Sen. Clayton Hee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Referred to EEP, ERB, FIN, referral sheet 33 | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 234) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Baker, Dela Cruz, Ige, Kidani, Kim, Kouchi, Nishihara . Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Slom, Solomon). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 609) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2011-02-22 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Slom. | |
2011-02-18 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-22-11 10:15AM in conference room 016. | |
2011-02-15 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. | |
2011-02-15 | (S) Reported from ENE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 183) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. | |
2011-02-08 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ENE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Green, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English. | |
2011-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-11 3:00PM in conference room 225. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Referred to ENE, JDL. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |