HI SB1046 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Allows an employee to take family leave in addition to victim leave for leave to seek safety, medical attention, or victim services related to domestic or sexual violence against the employee or the employee's minor child. Requires the employee to submit certification and employer confidentiality of information except under certain conditions. (SB1046 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Domestic Violence.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-22HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2).
2019-03-22HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1573), recommending referral to FIN.
2019-03-20HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Creagan, Lowen, McKelvey, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Yamane.
2019-03-19HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-20-19 2:10PM in conference room 325.
2019-03-19HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-20-19.
2019-03-15HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 03-19-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325.
2019-03-14HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takumi excused (1).
2019-03-14HouseReported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1294) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
2019-03-12HouseThe committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Eli, Kitagawa, McKelvey, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Quinlan.
2019-03-08HouseBill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 03-12-19 9:00AM in House conference room 309.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to LAB, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 352) in amended form (SD 2).
2019-03-05SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-03-01Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
2019-03-01SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1016) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2019-02-21SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kim, Fevella.
2019-02-15SenateThe committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-21-19 9:00AM in conference room 016.
2019-02-14SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
2019-02-14SenateReported from LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 343) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
2019-02-07SenateThe committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, S. Chang; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Fevella.
2019-02-04SenateThe committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-19 2:45PM in conference room 224.
2019-01-28SenateReferred to LCA, JDC.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB802 (Same As) 2019-02-01 - Re-referred to LAB, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 10

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback