HI SB1046 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1046
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases, to an unspecified amount, the authorized benefit for acupuncture treatments allowed under personal injury protection benefits provided through motor vehicle insurance. Automatically increases the amount by an unspecified percentage on an annual basis.
Title
Relating To Acupuncture.
Sponsors
Sen. Josh Green [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB907 (Same As) 2018-01-17 - Re-referred to HHS, CPC, referral sheet 1
SB1046 (Carry Over) 2017-01-27 - Referred to CPH, WAM.
SB1046 (Carry Over) 2017-01-27 - Referred to CPH, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1046&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SB1046_.HTM |