HI HB907 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB907

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-referred to HHS, CPC, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Increases, to an unspecified amount, the authorized benefit for acupuncture treatments allowed under personal injury protection benefits provided through motor vehicle insurance. Automatically increases the amount by an unspecified percentage on an annual basis.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Acupuncture.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-17HouseRe-referred to HHS, CPC, referral sheet 1
2017-11-30 Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
2017-01-27HouseReferred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 4
2017-01-25HousePass First Reading
2017-01-23HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB1046 (Same As) 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
HB907 (Carry Over) 2017-01-27 - Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 4

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback