HI SB1044 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1044
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires health insurance plans to cover 3D mammograms for cancer patients.
Title
Relating To Breast Cancer Screening.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-15 | Senate | The committee on CPH deferred the measure. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-19 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to CPH. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1044 (Carry Over) 2019-02-15 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
HB689 (Same As) 2019-01-24 - Referred to LAB, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 5
HB689 (Same As) 2019-01-24 - Referred to LAB, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 5
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1044&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB1044_.HTM |