HI SB1042 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-15 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-15 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the issuance of special purpose revenue bonds to SunStrong LLC, a renewable energy developer, for the provision of electric energy and installation of renewable energy projects in Hawaii. (SB1042 HD1)
Title
Special Purpose Revenue Bonds; SunStrong LLC; Renewable Energy Developer ($)
Sponsors
Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] |
Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Gil Riviere [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610). |
2016-04-14 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2016-04-13 | House | Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 647). |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Senate Conferee(s) discharged. |
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 05-01-15 4:30PM in conference room 225. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 05-01-15 11:05AM in conference room 225. |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-15 11:05AM in conference room 225. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-15 11:05AM in conference room 225. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-23-15 11:05AM in conference room 225. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 624). |
2015-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 642). |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: C. Lee, Lowen Co-Chairs; Ing, Pouha. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; English Co-Chair; Slom. |
2015-04-16 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 638). |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 565). |
2015-04-14 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Thielen, Tupola voting no (2) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-04-10 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1645), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-04-08 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka. |
2015-04-07 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2015-04-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-08-15 3:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2015-03-27 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Thielen voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Choy, Ing, Lowen, Luke, McKelvey, Pouha excused (6). |
2015-03-27 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1122) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2015-03-19 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Evans, Ing, Nishimoto, Say, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Pouha. |
2015-03-16 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 03-19-15 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2015-03-12 | House | Pass First Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 269) in amended form (SD 1). |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-15. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 813) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2015-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Dela Cruz, English, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Galuteria, Ruderman. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-27-15 1:00PM in conference room 211. |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Reported from ENE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 173) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in ENE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Green, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Slom. |
2015-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-15 2:45PM in conference room 225. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to ENE, WAM. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB801 (Same As) 2016-06-23 - Act 116, 06/22/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1217).