HI HB801 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-23 - Act 116, 06/22/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1217).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-23 - Act 116, 06/22/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1217).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the issuance of special purpose revenue bonds to SunStrong LLC, a renewable energy developer, for the provision of electric energy and installation of renewable energy projects in Hawaii. (HB801 CD1)
Title
Special Purpose Revenue Bonds; SunStrong LLC; Renewable Energy Developer ($)
Sponsors
Rep. Ken Ito [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-23 | Senate | Act 116, 06/22/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1217). |
2016-06-23 | House | Act 116, on 06/22/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1217). |
2016-05-05 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 685). |
2016-05-04 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 715). |
2016-05-03 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Souki excused (2). |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-29 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-16. |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 101-16). |
2016-04-29 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-03-16. |
2016-04-29 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 101-16) as amended in (CD 1). |
2016-04-29 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2016-04-29 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Pouha; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-28 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-29-16 4:00PM in conference room 225. |
2016-04-28 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday, 04-28-16 at 4:00PM in Conference Room 225. |
2016-04-27 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-28-16 9:30AM in conference room 225. |
2016-04-27 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday, 04-27-16 at 4:05PM in Conference Room 225. |
2016-04-26 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-27-16 9:30AM in conference room 225. |
2016-04-21 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 677). |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Inouye Chair; Riviere Co-Chair; Slom. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611). |
2016-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: C. Lee, Lowen Co-Chairs; Pouha. |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2016-04-14 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2016-04-12 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 504) in amended form (SD 2). |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Transmitted to House. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-16. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3503) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2016-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, Galuteria, Inouye, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto. |
2016-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-28-16 9:15AM in conference room 211. |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Reported from TRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2940) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2016-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, English, Kidani, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Chun Oakland, Slom. |
2016-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-16 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Re-Referred to TRE, WAM. |
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Referred to ENE, WAM. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 80). |
2015-03-06 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-03-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 696), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-02-27 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Yamashita, Pouha; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka, Ward. |
2015-02-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-27-15 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2015-02-19 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Oshiro, Souki excused (2). |
2015-02-19 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 377) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2015-02-17 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Evans, Nishimoto, Say, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ing, Pouha. |
2015-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-17-15 11:30AM in conference room 325. |
2015-02-12 | House | The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-17-15. |
2015-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-12-15 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2015-01-28 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1042 (Same As) 2016-04-15 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610).