HI SB104 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB104
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-09 - Referred to CPC, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-09 - Referred to CPC, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies the procedures to amend condominium association declarations, bylaws, and other governing instruments that are not of a material adverse nature to condominium owners or do not imperil the viability or stability of the condominium association. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Condominium Governing Instruments.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to CPC, referral sheet 27 |
2017-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 81) in amended form (SD 1). |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 701) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2017-03-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Espero, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Ruderman. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH deferred the measure until 03-01-17 10:00AM in conference room 229. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-23-17 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Referred to CPH. |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB104 (Carry Over) 2017-03-09 - Referred to CPC, referral sheet 27
HB897 (Same As) 2017-02-06 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 02-07-17 2:00PM in conference room 329.
HB897 (Same As) 2017-02-06 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 02-07-17 2:00PM in conference room 329.