HI SB103 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB103
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Removes the ability for a Mayor or the Governor to suspend electronic media transmission during a state of emergency.
Title
Relating To Emergency Management.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDC. |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Introduced and passed First Reading. |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB522 (Same As) 2024-03-25 - Received notice of discharge of all conferees (Hse. Com. No. 457).
SB103 (Carry Over) 2023-01-20 - Referred to PSM, JDC.
SB103 (Carry Over) 2023-01-20 - Referred to PSM, JDC.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=103&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB103_.HTM |