HI SB1024 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-05 - Act 226, 07/05/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1329).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-05 - Act 226, 07/05/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1329).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes long-term goals for zero-emissions transportation in Hawaii and abroad to reduce and eliminate transportation emissions. Establishes the clean ground transportation working group and the interisland and clean transportation working group. Requires reports to the Hawaii Climate Change Mitigation and Adaptation Commission and the Legislature. Effective 7/1/2023. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Transportation.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Lee [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-28 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-28 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-28 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-05 | Senate | Act 226, 07/05/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1329). |
2023-07-05 | House | Act 226, on 07/05/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1329). |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 900). |
2023-05-02 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 993). |
2023-05-02 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan excused (1). |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Excused, 0 (none). |
2023-04-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-23. |
2023-04-28 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 167) as amended in (CD 1). |
2023-04-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-23. |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 167). |
2023-04-28 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Todd, Lowen, Kila, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-04-28 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Gabbard, Inouye; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-23 11:10AM; Conference Room 329. |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-23 11:10AM; Conference Room 329. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-26-23 11:10AM; Conference Room 329. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 864). |
2023-04-24 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Todd, Lowen, Kila Co-Chairs; Matsumoto. |
2023-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 915). |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Lee Chair; Gabbard, Inouye Co-Chairs. |
2023-04-05 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 558). |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 610). |
2023-04-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Garcia voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and Representative(s) Mizuno excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2023-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1936), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2023-03-29 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2023-03-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-29-23 2:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-03-24 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Garcia voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ilagan excused (1). |
2023-03-24 | House | Reported from TRN/EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1519) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2023-03-21 | House | The committee on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Cochran, Gates, Kahaloa, Perruso, Woodson, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2023-03-21 | House | The committee on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Todd, Kila, Aiu, Evslin, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, Marten, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2023-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN/EEP on Tuesday, 03-21-23 11:30AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to TRN/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 17 |
2023-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2023-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 337) in amended form (SD 2). |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Richards. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-23. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 758) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2023-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-22-23 9:30AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Reported from TCA/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 469) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2023-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Richards, DeCoite ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TCA were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Elefante, Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye. |
2023-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-23 1:20PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Referred to TCA/AEN, WAM. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Department of Transportation
Ground Transportation
Interisland Transportation
Reports
Transpacific Transportation
Working Groups
Zero-emissions Transportation Goals
Ground Transportation
Interisland Transportation
Reports
Transpacific Transportation
Working Groups
Zero-emissions Transportation Goals