HI SB1024 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1024
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a cannabinoid medicine program within the University of Hawaii, to be administered by the John A. Burns school of medicine. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Education.
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Laura Acasio [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] |
Sen. Gil Riviere [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Higher Education: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Higher Education: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to HHH/HET, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 22 |
2021-03-11 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-03-09 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 322) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 706) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-24-21 10:00AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Reported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 416) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HRE were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, Keith-Agaran, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE deferred the measure until 02-16-21 3:05PM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-21 3:05PM in conference room 229. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Re-Referred to HRE, WAM. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to HRE/HTH, WAM. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1024 (Carry Over) 2021-03-11 - Referred to HHH/HET, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 22
Subjects
Cannabinoid Medicine Expert
Cannabinoid Medicine Program
John A. Burns School of Medicine
University of Hawaii
Cannabinoid Medicine Program
John A. Burns School of Medicine
University of Hawaii