HI SB1020 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1020
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires health insurers, mutual benefit societies, and health maintenance organizations to provide coverage for medication used for the treatment of obesity or weight loss management for a covered individual who is overweight and has one or more related comorbidities.
Title
Relating To Health.
Sponsors
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Re-Referred to HHS, CPN/WAM. |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Referred to HHS, CPN. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB965 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
SB1020 (Carry Over) 2023-02-01 - Re-Referred to HHS, CPN/WAM.
SB1020 (Carry Over) 2023-02-01 - Re-Referred to HHS, CPN/WAM.
Subjects
Comorbidities
Health Insurance
Mandatory Health Coverage Weight Management Medication
Obesity
Overweight
Health Insurance
Mandatory Health Coverage Weight Management Medication
Obesity
Overweight
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1020&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB1020_.HTM |