HI SB1001 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on July 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-08 - Act 215, 07/07/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1316).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on July 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-08 - Act 215, 07/07/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1316).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes and appropriates funds for the manufacturing development program, through which the high technology development corporation shall distribute grants to Hawaii manufacturers for various activities. (CD1)
Title
Manufacturing; Income Tax Credit; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] |
Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
Sen. Sam Slom [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-08 | Senate | Act 215, 07/07/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1316). |
2015-07-08 | House | Act 215, on 07/07/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1316). |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 680). |
2015-05-05 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 699). |
2015-05-05 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Har voting no (1) and Representative(s) Tsuji excused (1). |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2015-05-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-05-15. |
2015-05-01 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 139) as amended in (CD 1). |
2015-05-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-05-15. |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 139). |
2015-05-01 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Kawakami, Johanson, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Brower. |
2015-05-01 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Kouchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 05-01-15 2:35PM in conference room 423. |
2015-04-28 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 05-01-15 10:00AM in conference room 423. |
2015-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-28-15 10:00AM in conference room 423. |
2015-04-22 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-24-15 10:00AM in conference room 423. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 624). |
2015-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 642). |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Kawakami, Johanson Co-Chairs; Brower, Ward. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Wakai Chair; Tokuda Co-Chair; Dela Cruz, Kouchi, Slom. |
2015-04-16 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 638). |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 558). |
2015-04-14 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Nishimoto excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-04-10 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1542), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-04-07 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. |
2015-04-02 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-07-15 2:45PM in conference room 308. |
2015-04-02 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be deferred until 04-07-15. |
2015-04-01 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2015-03-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 04-02-15 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2015-03-27 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Choy, Ing, Lowen, Luke, McKelvey, Pouha excused (6). |
2015-03-27 | House | Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1142) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2015-03-24 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Brower, Choy, DeCoite, Ito, Ohno, Onishi, Tokioka, Tsuji, Matsumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cachola, Woodson. |
2015-03-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Tuesday, 03-24-15 9:00AM in House conference room 312. |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2015-03-12 | House | Pass First Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 253) in amended form (SD 2). |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-15. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 713) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2015-03-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 03-03-15 9:15AM in conference room 211. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-26-15 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Reported from EDT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 504) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2015-02-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDT were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Slom, Baker, Dela Cruz, Espero, Harimoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland. |
2015-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDT will hold a public decision making on 02-18-15 2:51PM in conference room 016. |
2015-02-09 | Senate | The committee on EDT deferred the measure. |
2015-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDT deferred the measure until 02-06-15 3:00PM in conference room 016. |
2015-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDT has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-15 2:45PM in conference room 016. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to EDT, WAM. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Introduced. |