HI HR98 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-01 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-01 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Mayor Of The County Of Kauai, The Kauai County Council, Kauai Planning And Action Alliance, West Side Kauai Communities, And The Waimea Sports Complex Steering Committee To Collaborate To Expedite The Construction Of The Waimea Sports Complex.
Title
Waimea Sports Complex
Sponsors
Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Faye Hanohano [D] | Rep. Derek Kawakami [D] |
Rep. James Tokioka [D] | Rep. Kaniela Ing [D] | Rep. Bertrand Kobayashi [D] | Rep. Richard Onishi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-01 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2013-04-01 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and McKelvey excused (1). |
2013-04-01 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1312), recommending adoption. |
2013-03-25 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Lowen, Kawakami; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Coffman, Hanohano, Fale; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cullen, C. Lee, Thielen. |
2013-03-21 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by WAL on Monday, 03-25-13 9:00AM in conference room 325. |
2013-03-18 | House | Referred to WAL, referral sheet 39 |
2013-03-13 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR127 (Same As) 2013-04-09 - Referred to PSM/EGH, WAM.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=98&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/HR98_.HTM |