HI HR97 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Commending And Supporting The Pacific International Space Center For Exploration Systems' Collaborative Work With The National Aeronautics And Space Administration And Private Industries In The Areas Of Basaltic Concrete And Additive Manufacturing And Requesting Collaboration To Explore Opportunities For Applications Of Basaltic Concrete And Additive Manufacturing.
Title
PISCES; Basaltic Concrete; Additive Manufacturing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-31 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2014-03-31 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll, Hashem excused (2). |
2014-03-31 | House | Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1346-14), recommending adoption. |
2014-03-21 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Ward, Cachola, Ito, Choy, Onishi; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Awana, Brower, Ohno, Tokioka, Wooley. |
2014-03-18 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDB on Friday, 03-21-14 9:30AM in conference room 312. |
2014-03-12 | House | Referred to EDB, referral sheet 33 |
2014-03-07 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR133 (Same As) 2014-04-08 - Referred to PSM/EGH.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=97&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/bills/HR97_.HTM |